Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/27/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/28/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/07/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/08/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/27/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/27/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/15/2001