Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/14/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/26/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/26/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/26/2002