Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/20/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/28/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/17/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/26/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/19/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/19/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/19/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/29/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/29/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/17/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/18/2002