Refine your search

Showing 12 of 12 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
11/02/2002 Became Public Law No: 107-273.
11/02/2002 Signed by President.
10/23/2002 Presented to President.
10/03/2002 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2002 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 400 - 4 (Roll no. 422).(consideration: CR H6743-6751)
09/25/2002 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 107-685 filed.(text of conference report: CR H6586-6649)
12/20/2001 To conference: Senate insists on its amendments, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Hatch, Kennedy and Leahy.
12/20/2001 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
10/30/2001 Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/23/2001 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4384-4389)
07/10/2001 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-125.
06/19/2001 Introduced in House