Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/27/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/27/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/27/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/12/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/12/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/16/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/16/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/26/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/05/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/05/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/12/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/12/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/09/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/30/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/07/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/13/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/27/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/12/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 12/12/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/12/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/12/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 12/13/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/13/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 12/13/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/29/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/29/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/06/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/06/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/12/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/12/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/26/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/26/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/26/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/26/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/28/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/07/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/12/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/12/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/12/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/13/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/18/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/11/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/11/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/16/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/16/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/22/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/23/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/01/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/01/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/14/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/22/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/17/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/17/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 06/27/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/27/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/27/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/12/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/12/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/12/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/12/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/12/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/12/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/18/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/25/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/04/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/11/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/11/2002