Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/19/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/19/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/19/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/24/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/25/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/25/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/26/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/30/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/30/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/31/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/31/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/31/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/31/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/31/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/31/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/31/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 08/01/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/02/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/06/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/06/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/06/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/06/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/06/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/06/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/06/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/06/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/06/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/06/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/06/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/06/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/12/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/12/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/12/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/12/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/12/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/14/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/14/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/14/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/20/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/20/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/24/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/24/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/24/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/24/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/24/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/24/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/24/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/25/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/25/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/25/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/02/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/02/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/02/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/09/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/09/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/09/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/09/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/09/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/10/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/17/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/30/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/31/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/31/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/31/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/07/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 11/13/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 11/13/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/15/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/15/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/16/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 12/04/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 12/04/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/13/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/19/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 01/29/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/29/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/26/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/12/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/11/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/16/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/22/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/12/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/12/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/18/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/25/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/04/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/17/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/17/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/21/2002