Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/26/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/26/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/10/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/10/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/19/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 08/02/2001