Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/19/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/21/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/28/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/18/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/18/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/23/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/27/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/05/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/19/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/19/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/05/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/05/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/09/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/29/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/29/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/31/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/15/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 11/27/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 12/12/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/23/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/23/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/26/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/06/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/04/2002