Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/06/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/09/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/22/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/05/2002