Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/03/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/07/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/07/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/07/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/07/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/07/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/07/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/07/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/07/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/07/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/07/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/07/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/07/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/07/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/07/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/07/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/07/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/07/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/07/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/07/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/07/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/07/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/07/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/07/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/07/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/07/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/07/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/07/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/07/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/07/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/07/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/07/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/07/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/07/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/07/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/07/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/07/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/07/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/07/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/07/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/07/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/07/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/07/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/07/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/07/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/07/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/07/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/07/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/07/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/27/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/27/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/06/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/21/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/21/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/21/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/21/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/21/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/03/2001