There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for work authorization for nonimmigrant spouses of treaty traders and treaty investors.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
01/16/2002Became Public Law No: 107-124. (TXT | PDF)
01/16/2002Signed by President.
01/04/2002Presented to President.
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14063)
12/13/2001Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
09/05/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5357)
08/02/2001Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-187.
06/21/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/16/2002Became Public Law No: 107-124. (TXT | PDF)
01/16/2002Signed by President.
01/04/2002HousePresented to President.
12/21/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2001SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14063)
12/13/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
12/13/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
12/13/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/16/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/06/2001SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/05/2001-3:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/05/2001-3:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5357)
09/05/2001-3:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2277.
09/05/2001-3:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5357)
09/05/2001-3:20pmHouseMr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/02/2001HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 109.
08/02/2001HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-187.
07/24/2001HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/24/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/27/2001HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims
06/27/2001HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims
06/25/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/21/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
06/21/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/26/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/10/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary06/21/2001 Referred to
07/24/2001 Markup by
08/02/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-187
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims06/25/2001 Referred to
06/27/2001 Markup by
06/27/2001 Reported by
Senate Judiciary10/16/2001 Referred to
12/13/2001 Markup by
12/13/2001 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2277. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (08/02/2001)

Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to authorize the nonimmigrant spouses of treaty trader or treaty investor (E visa) aliens to work in the United States.