Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/21/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/21/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/21/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/18/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/05/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/05/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/20/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/22/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/22/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/22/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/11/2002