Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/21/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/21/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 06/21/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/27/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/04/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/04/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/20/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/12/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/12/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/16/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/04/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/13/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/13/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/08/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/09/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/23/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/23/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/04/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/05/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/11/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/11/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/17/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/07/2002