Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/25/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/28/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/24/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/24/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/25/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/30/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/30/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 08/01/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/02/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/06/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/06/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/06/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/06/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/06/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/20/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/20/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/04/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/05/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/05/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/16/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/29/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/05/2002