Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/28/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/28/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/28/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/28/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/28/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/16/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/16/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/16/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/16/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/16/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/16/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/16/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/16/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/16/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/17/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/19/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/26/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/31/2001