Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/26/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/26/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 06/26/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/26/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/27/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 06/27/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/28/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/28/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/12/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/12/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/12/2001
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/12/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/18/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/18/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/18/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/18/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/23/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/23/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/23/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/23/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/25/2001