Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/28/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/28/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/18/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/18/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/18/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/18/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/18/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/18/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/18/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/18/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/18/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/18/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/18/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/18/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/18/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/18/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/18/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/18/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/24/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/24/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/24/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/24/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/24/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/24/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/24/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/24/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/24/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/27/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/27/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/27/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/27/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/27/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/27/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/27/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/31/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/31/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/31/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/31/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/31/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/01/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 08/01/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 08/01/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/01/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 08/02/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/06/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/06/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/06/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 09/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/06/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 10/17/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/17/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/17/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/17/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/17/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/17/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/20/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/28/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/28/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/28/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/10/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/10/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/10/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/16/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/16/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/16/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/16/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/17/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/17/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/17/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/04/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/25/2002