Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/27/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/27/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/27/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/27/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/27/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 06/27/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/28/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/28/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/12/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/12/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/12/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/12/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/12/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/12/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/12/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/17/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/17/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/17/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/17/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/17/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/20/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/20/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/20/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/20/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/20/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/26/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/26/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/26/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/26/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/26/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/26/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/26/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/27/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/27/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 08/02/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/05/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/05/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/14/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/14/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/14/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/21/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/04/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 10/12/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/12/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/17/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/01/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/08/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/23/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/12/2002