Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/31/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/24/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/13/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/14/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/26/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/05/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/12/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/20/2002