Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/26/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/05/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/21/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/21/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/24/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 09/24/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/09/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/28/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/28/2001