Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/10/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/17/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/19/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/19/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/23/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/24/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/26/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/27/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/27/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/05/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/05/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/13/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/27/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/27/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/05/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/19/2002