Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/10/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/10/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/10/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/10/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/10/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/11/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/11/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/11/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/11/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/11/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/17/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/17/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/17/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/17/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/23/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/23/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/23/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/23/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/23/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/23/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/23/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/23/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/26/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/26/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/26/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/26/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/26/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/26/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/31/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/31/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/31/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/31/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/31/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/31/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/31/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/31/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/31/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/31/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/31/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/02/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 08/02/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 08/02/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 08/02/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 08/02/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/06/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/06/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/13/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/13/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/13/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/13/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/25/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/11/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/11/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/11/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/30/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/30/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/30/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/08/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/08/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/14/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/14/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/14/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/15/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/15/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/15/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/15/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/15/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 11/27/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 11/27/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/27/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/27/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/27/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/27/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/27/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 12/04/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/06/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 12/06/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 12/13/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/18/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/18/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/18/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/20/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/20/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 12/20/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/18/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/18/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/09/2002