Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/27/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/27/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/27/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/27/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/27/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/11/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/11/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/17/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/17/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/24/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/24/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/24/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/24/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/30/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/30/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/30/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/30/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/31/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/31/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/05/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/05/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/12/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/12/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/12/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/12/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/02/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/02/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/04/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/17/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/06/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/06/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/06/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/09/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 11/13/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/13/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/15/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/15/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/15/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/15/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 11/15/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/15/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/15/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/19/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/19/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/19/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 11/27/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/27/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/27/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/27/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/27/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/29/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/29/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/29/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 12/04/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/10/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/10/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/11/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 12/11/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/12/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 12/13/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/17/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/17/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 12/17/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/17/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/18/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/18/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/18/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 12/18/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/18/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/18/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 12/20/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/20/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/20/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 12/20/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/20/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/20/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/20/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 12/20/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/20/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 12/20/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/23/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/23/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 01/23/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 01/23/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/23/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 01/23/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/23/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/23/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/23/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/23/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/23/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 01/23/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/08/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/12/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/12/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/12/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/12/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/10/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/10/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/16/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/24/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/12/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/17/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/17/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/18/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/25/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/09/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/09/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/09/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/09/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/09/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/10/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/15/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/16/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/22/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/02/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/15/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/15/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 11/12/2002