Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/31/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/23/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/11/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/11/2002