Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/19/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/26/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/26/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/26/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/26/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/26/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/26/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/26/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/26/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/26/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/26/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/31/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/31/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/31/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/31/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/31/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/31/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/31/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/31/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/31/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/31/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/31/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/31/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/31/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/01/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 08/01/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/01/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 08/01/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 08/01/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 08/01/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/02/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/10/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/10/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/20/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 09/20/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/21/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/21/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/25/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/25/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/25/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/25/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/25/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/04/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/09/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/09/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/09/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/11/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/12/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/16/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/17/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/17/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/30/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/30/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/30/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 10/31/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/01/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/01/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/08/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/08/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/08/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 11/08/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/14/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/14/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/14/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/16/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/16/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/16/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/29/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 11/29/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/29/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 12/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 12/06/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 12/20/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 12/20/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/12/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/30/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/20/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/06/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/11/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/18/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/27/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/11/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/16/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/26/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/10/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/11/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/24/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 10/01/2002