Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 01/06/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/06/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/06/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/06/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/06/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/31/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/31/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 01/31/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 01/31/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/31/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 01/31/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/31/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 01/31/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/31/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 01/31/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 01/31/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 01/31/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/31/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/31/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/31/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/31/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/31/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 01/31/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/31/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/31/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/31/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/31/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/31/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/31/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/31/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/31/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/31/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/31/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/31/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/31/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 01/31/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 01/31/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/31/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/31/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 01/31/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/31/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/31/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/31/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/31/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/31/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/31/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/06/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 02/06/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/06/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/06/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/06/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/06/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/06/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/14/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/14/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/14/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/14/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/14/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/14/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/06/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/06/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/06/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/06/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 03/06/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/06/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/13/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/27/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 03/27/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/27/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/28/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/03/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/03/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/15/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/15/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/22/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/28/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/23/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/12/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/17/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/06/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/11/2002