Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/28/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/27/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/25/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/03/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 10/03/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/03/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/03/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/03/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/03/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/03/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/03/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/03/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/03/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/03/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/03/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/03/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/03/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/03/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/04/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/04/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/05/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/11/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/11/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/16/2001