Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/11/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/01/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/05/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/05/2001