Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/12/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/12/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/12/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/12/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/13/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/24/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/09/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/11/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/16/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/30/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/30/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/30/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/14/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 11/15/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 11/27/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 12/04/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 01/29/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/29/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/05/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/13/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/16/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/11/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/02/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/02/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/02/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/02/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/02/2002