Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/28/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/28/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 06/28/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/28/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/10/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/11/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/11/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/11/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/19/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/19/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/19/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/25/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/25/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/25/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/25/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/25/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/25/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/25/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/30/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/30/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/30/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/30/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/30/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/30/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/30/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/30/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/30/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/30/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/30/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/30/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/30/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/30/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/30/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/30/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/30/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/30/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/30/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/30/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/30/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/30/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/30/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/31/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/31/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/31/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/31/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/31/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/31/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/31/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/31/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/31/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/06/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/06/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/06/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/06/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/06/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/06/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/06/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/06/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/06/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/14/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/14/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/14/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/14/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/14/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/14/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/21/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/03/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/03/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/03/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/03/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/07/2001