Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/20/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/20/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 01/20/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 01/20/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/20/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 01/30/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/30/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 01/30/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/30/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 01/30/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/30/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 01/30/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/30/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 01/31/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/31/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/14/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/14/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/14/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/27/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 02/27/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/28/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 03/01/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/28/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/03/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/20/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/27/2001