Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/11/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/11/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/17/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/18/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/27/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/10/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/10/2001