Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/30/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 09/13/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/13/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 09/13/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/13/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/25/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/25/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/25/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/25/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/25/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/04/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/10/2002