Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/16/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/16/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/16/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/16/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/11/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/11/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/20/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 01/29/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/27/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/20/2002