Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/06/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/06/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/06/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/06/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/06/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/06/2001
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/08/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/08/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/12/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/12/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/12/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/12/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/12/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/12/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/12/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/12/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/06/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/14/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/19/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/29/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/07/2002