Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/18/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/18/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/18/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/18/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/18/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/18/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/18/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/18/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/18/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/18/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/18/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/18/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/18/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/18/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/18/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/27/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/27/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/27/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/27/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/27/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/27/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 08/02/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 08/02/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 08/02/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/02/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 08/02/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 08/02/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 08/02/2001
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 08/02/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 08/02/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/02/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 08/02/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 08/02/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/02/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 08/02/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 08/02/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 08/02/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/21/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/21/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 09/21/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/21/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/21/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/21/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/21/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/10/2001