Committees: H.R.2458 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform07/11/2001 Referred to
10/09/2002 Markup by
11/14/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-787
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Government Efficiency, Financial Management and Intergovernmental Relations07/20/2001 Referred to
10/08/2002 Discharged from
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Technology and Procurement Policy07/02/2002 Referred to
09/18/2002 Hearings by
10/01/2002 Markup by
10/01/2002 Reported by
House Judiciary11/14/2002 Referred to
11/14/2002 Discharged from