Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/11/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/19/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/19/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/26/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 08/01/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/06/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/06/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/10/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/11/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/29/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/16/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/16/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/16/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/18/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/18/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/18/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/18/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/18/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/18/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/18/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/18/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/18/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/18/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 04/18/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/18/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/18/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/24/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/24/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 04/24/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/24/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/24/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/24/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/30/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/30/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/01/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/08/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/14/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/12/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/19/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/25/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/25/2002