Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/24/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/24/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/24/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/24/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/24/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/27/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/30/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/01/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/01/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 12/13/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/13/2001