Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 07/17/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/17/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/14/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/14/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/14/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/14/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/03/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/03/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/11/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/11/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/07/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/07/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/07/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/08/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/15/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/29/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/06/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/06/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/06/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/13/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/13/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/13/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/28/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/28/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/28/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/28/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/28/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/28/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/28/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/07/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/07/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/07/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/07/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 03/07/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/07/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/07/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/11/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/11/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/11/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/11/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/11/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/17/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 04/17/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/09/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/09/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/23/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/23/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/12/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/12/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/12/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/12/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/12/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/18/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/18/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/18/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/18/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/20/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/20/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/16/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/16/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/16/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/16/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/24/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/26/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/26/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/26/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/10/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/10/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/10/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/18/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/01/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/01/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/01/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/02/2002