There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Rate Amendments of 2001

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Benefits Act of 2001

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Benefits Act of 2001

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Benefits Act of 2001

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Rate Amendments of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to make various improvements to veterans benefits programs under laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An act to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide a cost-of-living adjustment in the rates of disability compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for survivors of such veterans.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
12/21/2001Became Public Law No: 107-94. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2001Signed by President.
12/13/2001Presented to President.
12/11/2001Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H9121-9124; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9121-9122)
11/15/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
11/15/2001Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/31/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 301).(text: CR H4896-4899)
07/24/2001Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 107-156.
07/18/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (29)

Date Chamber
12/21/2001Became Public Law No: 107-94. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2001Signed by President.
12/13/2001HousePresented to President.
12/11/2001-4:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2001-4:16pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H9121-9124; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9121-9122)
12/11/2001-4:09pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 2540.
12/11/2001-4:09pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments.
11/15/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/15/2001SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
11/15/2001SenateS.Amdt.2150 Amendment SA 2150 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/15/2001SenateS.Amdt.2150 Amendment SA 2150 proposed by Senator Rockefeller for Senator Reid. (consideration: CR S11872; text: CR S11872) To amend the title.
11/15/2001SenateS.Amdt.2149 Amendment SA 2149 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/15/2001SenateS.Amdt.2149 Amendment SA 2149 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Rockefeller. (consideration: CR S11871-11872; text: CR S11871-11872) To propose a substitute.
11/15/2001SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S11871-11872)
11/15/2001SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/31/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/31/2001-2:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 301). (text: CR H4896-4899)
07/31/2001-2:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/31/2001-2:43pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4916)
07/31/2001-1:07pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/31/2001-12:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2540.
07/31/2001-12:27pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4896-4906)
07/31/2001-12:27pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/24/2001HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 92.
07/24/2001HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 107-156.
07/19/2001HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
07/19/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/18/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/18/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/18/2001 Referred to
07/19/2001 Markup by
07/24/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-156
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/31/2001 Referred to
11/15/2001 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2540. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/15/2001)

Veterans' Compensation Rate Amendments of 2001 - Increases, as of December 1, 2001, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled adult children, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and for children.