Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/18/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/24/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/24/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/25/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/25/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/25/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/27/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/06/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 11/15/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/15/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/15/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/15/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/27/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 11/27/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/27/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 11/27/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/17/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/05/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/05/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/28/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/28/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/25/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/09/2002