Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/18/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/14/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/14/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/14/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/19/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/19/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 09/24/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/25/2001