Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/19/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/19/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/19/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/19/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 07/19/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/19/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/19/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/24/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/24/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/25/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/25/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/25/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 08/01/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/01/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 08/01/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 08/01/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/01/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/02/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/02/2001