Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/05/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/16/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/26/2002