Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/19/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/19/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 08/02/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 08/02/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/21/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 09/21/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/19/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 11/19/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/19/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/19/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/19/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/19/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/20/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/20/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 12/20/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/20/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/12/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/12/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/12/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/27/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/07/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/07/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/19/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/19/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/19/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/19/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/19/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/19/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/19/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/18/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/18/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/24/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/25/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/30/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/01/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/02/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/20/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/04/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/04/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/06/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/11/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/19/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/19/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/26/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/08/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/08/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/17/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/17/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/24/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/25/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/05/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/05/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/25/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/25/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/26/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/10/2002