Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/19/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 07/19/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/23/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/23/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/23/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/23/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/23/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/23/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/26/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/26/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/26/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/31/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/02/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 08/02/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/04/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/04/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/04/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/13/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/13/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/13/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 12/04/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/11/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/12/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/20/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/06/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/26/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/26/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/12/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/01/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/02/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/08/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/21/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/21/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/06/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/26/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/26/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/05/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/05/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/10/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/19/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/26/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/26/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/02/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/02/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/02/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/03/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/07/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/16/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/16/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/13/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/13/2002