Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/06/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/27/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 04/24/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/17/2001