Refine your search

12 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/26/2001 Became Public Law No: 107-73.
11/26/2001 Signed by President.
11/15/2001 Presented to President.
11/08/2001 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 87 - 7. Record Vote Number: 334.
11/08/2001 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 401 - 18 (Roll no. 434).
11/06/2001 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 107-272 filed.(text of conference report: CR H7787-7834)
11/06/2001 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
08/02/2001 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Mikulski, Leahy, Harkin, Byrd, Kohl, Johnson, Hollings, Inouye, Bond, Burns, Shelby, Craig, Domenici, DeWine and Stevens.
08/02/2001 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 5. Record Vote Number: 269.(text as passed: CR 8/03/2001 S8980-8993)
07/31/2001 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 336 - 89 (Roll no. 297).
07/25/2001 The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 107-159, by Mr. Walsh.
07/25/2001 Introduced in House