Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/02/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/05/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/10/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/10/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/29/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/22/2002